U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kappel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • November 07, 2022: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • March 16, 2022: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Release from Custody]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 17, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
  • September 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.