U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poelstra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 30, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 18, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response]
  • December 19, 2017: [Request]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.