U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40106-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Venegas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Seal Existing Document]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 09, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 03, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 03, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 06, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [For Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Receipt]
  • February 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • December 19, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • December 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 18, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Verdict]
  • December 18, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • December 18, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 18, 2018: [Jury List]
  • December 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 12, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 11, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 11, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 03, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • November 08, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • November 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 04, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 01, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2018: [Response]
  • January 16, 2018: [Request]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 12, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 09, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2017: [Request]
  • December 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.