U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 16, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response]
  • August 17, 2018: [Response]
  • August 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Response]
  • August 13, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 29, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 04, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 04, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 09, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2018: [Response]
  • January 11, 2018: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Request]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 07, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.