U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01008
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Dahle et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • December 08, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • December 08, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.