U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40579
  • Case Name: Jonathan Mark Willaredt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request to Discontinue Service of Notice (text entry)]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approving/Denying Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Affidavit]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
February, 2018
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.