U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boneshirt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 21, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.