U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-10161
  • Case Name: Steven Bradley Goehring and Julie Rae Goehring
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.