U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joaquin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 19, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 19, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2019: [Forfeiture]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2018: [Consent]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 24, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • January 26, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 25, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 25, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2017: [Request]
  • December 22, 2017: [Request]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2017: [Request]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.