U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oka
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Receipt]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 02, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 02, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 10, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 09, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 09, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 09, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 15, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 14, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 14, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 12, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 23, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 23, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Verdict]
  • February 23, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • February 23, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • February 23, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 22, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 22, 2018: [Jury List]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • February 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • February 15, 2018: [Produce ]
  • February 15, 2018: [Bifurcate ]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 15, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 09, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 01, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Request]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.