U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 10, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 04, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 26, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 14, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 09, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 26, 2019: [Objection]
  • August 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 25, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 04, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 13, 2019: [Extend]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 29, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • January 23, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 17, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 03, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 05, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2018: [Suppress]
  • January 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
  • January 01, 2018: [Objection]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • December 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.