U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 24, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • April 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 25, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 19, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 04, 2018: [Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Remark]
  • March 06, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 21, 2018: [Response]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 23, 2018: [Response]
  • January 17, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 17, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.