U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 18, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Furlough]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2018: [Request]
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.