U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bull Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 25, 2022: [Reconsideration]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Request]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.