U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LeBeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 04, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 21, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • August 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 01, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2017: [Request]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.