U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.