U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50270
  • Case Name: Jeffrey J. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Show Cause]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2017
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Creditor List]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.