U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50271
  • Case Name: Sara Anne Rufledt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.