U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01009
  • Case Name: Allred v. Jundt Associates, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Default Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Default Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 18, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
  • February 13, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Additional Summons Issued]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Additional Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 20, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • December 29, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.