U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poitra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 30, 2018: [Furlough]
  • January 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.