U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cecena-Becerrio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2018: [Request]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.