U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 29, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.