U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farrow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • August 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 21, 2018: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 05, 2018: [Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 23, 2018: [Response]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2018: [Request]
  • January 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.