U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 26, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 23, 2018: [Response]
  • January 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.