U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 05, 2018: [Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Response]
  • January 22, 2018: [Request]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.