U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinoza-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 07, 2018: [Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 10, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.