U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ritesman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 08, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Response]
  • July 01, 2020: [Text Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 19, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 19, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 19, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 19, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 08, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 31, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 15, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 14, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 14, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 25, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 24, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Verdict]
  • April 29, 2019: [Response]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 24, 2019: [Jury List]
  • April 23, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • April 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 15, 2019: [Response]
  • April 15, 2019: [Leave to]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2019: [Response]
  • April 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 06, 2019: [Change Venue]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Compel ]
  • April 05, 2019: [Certificate]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 27, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 13, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2018: [Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.