U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05001
  • Case Name: Allred v. Gibson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Default Judgment]
  • February 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Default Judgment]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.