U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30001
  • Case Name: Daniel Lee Tedrow and Jodi Lee Tedrow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.