U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tai-Cuc
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Response]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2018: [Request]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.