U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40015
  • Case Name: Donald James Cotton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Employee Income Records]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.