U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30101-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 19, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 07, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • April 02, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 05, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 11, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 26, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 21, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Verdict]
  • September 20, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 20, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • September 20, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 20, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 19, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 19, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 19, 2018: [Material Witness Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2018: [Arrest of Material Witness]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Jury List]
  • September 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 17, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 17, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 16, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 15, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 15, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 14, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 14, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 12, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 11, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 11, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Jury List]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 04, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 03, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 16, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Suppress]
  • August 08, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Revoke]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 18, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 18, 2018: [Request]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 12, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.