U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40018
  • Case Name: Scott Christian Biskeborn and Jenna Eileen Biskeborn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service Pursuant to LBR 9072-1(b) of Proposed Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume/Reject (deactivated)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compel Assumption or Rejection of Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by Creditor)]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Employee Income Records]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.