U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Bear, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 10, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 27, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.