U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 05, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 25, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • July 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • January 23, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 23, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Request]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2018: [Request]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.