U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Good House, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 14, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • June 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 23, 2018: [Request]
  • January 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2018: [Request]
  • January 17, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.