U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marrowbone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Request]
  • January 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.