U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Traversie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 19, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 14, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 02, 2018: [Furlough]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 23, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 16, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 22, 2018: [Request]
  • January 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.