U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 15, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 08, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Request]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 06, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.