U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendricks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 20, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • July 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • July 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 10, 2018: [Waiver]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2018: [Request]
  • January 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.