U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 03, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 05, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Request]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Request]
  • February 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.