U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Request]
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 29, 2018: [Request]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.