U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2023: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 13, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • January 13, 2023: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 04, 2019: [Extend]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Witness List]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Competency Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2018: [Furlough]
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2018: [Medical Exam]
  • October 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 13, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Suppress]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2018: [Request]
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 31, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.