U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2018: [Request]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 16, 2018: [Request]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.