U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dornbusch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 02, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 01, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.