U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 06, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 19, 2018: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.