U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sampson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.