U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04001
  • Case Name: Andes State Bank v. Podzimek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 27, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Striking Document]
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.