U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crowe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 30, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 23, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 21, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 20, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 18, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2020: [Supplement]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Extend]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 27, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [New Trial]
  • December 03, 2019: [New Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 22, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Verdict]
  • November 21, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • November 21, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • November 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 21, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 21, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • November 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 20, 2019: [Objection]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 19, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • November 19, 2019: [Jury List]
  • November 19, 2019: [Voir Dire Began]
  • November 19, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 17, 2019: [Response]
  • November 16, 2019: [Objection]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Joinder]
  • November 15, 2019: [Objection]
  • November 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 12, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 12, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 06, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 05, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 01, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Response]
  • October 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2019: [Joinder]
  • October 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 25, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 24, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Request]
  • October 16, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 30, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (deactivated)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • April 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 22, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 03, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 04, 2018: [Furlough]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 06, 2018: [Request]
  • February 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.