U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Palencia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Request]
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 26, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.